judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SOARES (WESLEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36186
Short Caption:SOARES (WESLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000272Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-08841
06/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. It appears that appellant was represented by Mary Pat Barry during the lower court proceedings. Mary Pat Barry shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 00-10228
07/06/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-11525
07/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12748
08/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14572
08/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/24/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 22, 2000. 00-14572