judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANK EUGENE KELLER, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING,

Case Heading (S-07-0085)
Case Number:S-07-0085Case Docketed On:04/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:FRANK EUGENE KELLER, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING,
Full Title:FRANK EUGENE KELLER, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank Eugene Keller Jr.Kurt A. Infanger
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 170
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/17/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/05/2007Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
06/08/2007Motion - Reinstatement of appeal dismissed for want of prosecutionMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
06/27/2007Order - ReinstatementOrderReinstatementFinal
06/27/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
08/10/2007Brief - Appellee; received brief of appellee on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, confidential folder; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kurt Infanger for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Rehurek for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/20/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court, Kurt Alan Infanger for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/20/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/30/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/15/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/15/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/19/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/16/07 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal