judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-201
A-201
05/29/1944
Application for Writ of Error
A. AND M. CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
CITY OF BRYAN, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/31/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/20/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
06/07/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/03/1945Letter Filed
01/31/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/20/1944Brief on the Merits
10/19/1944Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
10/19/1944Bond
10/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1944Response to Petition
05/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/29/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Bryan, TexasRespondent
A. and M. Consolidated Independent School DistrictPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information