Case Information: 38999 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011705 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/31/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/31/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 01-21918 | |
01/18/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. | 02-01340 | |
02/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. (Response). | 02-02222 | |
02/12/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the response to the order to show cause. | 02-02729 | |
02/14/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 02-02978 | |
02/21/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 14, 2002, counsel for appellant filed a response to this court's order to show cause. Pursuant to Kellogg, this court concludes that this court has jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant is hereby ordered to comply with NRAP 3C and within 10 days from the date of this order, file a transcript request form or a certificate stating that no transcript is required. Further, counsel for appellant shall file a fast track statement (and appendix) within 40 days of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 02-03311 | |
02/28/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-03727 | |
04/03/2002 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 9, 2002. | 02-05924 | |
04/09/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-06294 | |
04/09/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 02-06295 | |
04/16/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-06796 | |
05/31/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-09536 | |
06/25/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-09600 | |
06/25/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/28/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 25, 2002. | 02-09600 |