Case: 09-90-00155-CR
09-90-00155-CR
08/24/1990
Delivery of a Drug
Plant, Luther Kenneth
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/28/1992 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
02/26/1992 | Petition for Review | Refused | |
12/30/1991 | Petition for Review | Filed in Higher Court | |
12/19/1991 | Petition for Review | | |
12/05/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
11/21/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
11/14/1991 | Miscellaneous Motions | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/13/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/08/1991 | Miscellaneous Motions | | |
10/31/1991 | Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/25/1991 | Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief | | |
10/25/1991 | Supplemental Brief Received | | |
10/17/1991 | Submitted | | |
10/17/1991 | Submission | | |
06/11/1991 | Submission | | |
04/25/1991 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/24/1991 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/17/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
04/17/1991 | Brief received, not filed | | |
03/18/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
12/18/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/14/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/16/1990 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
10/04/1990 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/18/1990 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
09/12/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |
08/24/1990 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/24/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/05/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Plant, Luther Kenneth | Appellant | Luther Kenneth Plant |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Greg Dumas |
Kenneth Luther Plant | Appellant | Louis Dugas, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court
Orange
Honorable David A. Dunn
B900127
18 years