judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2940
A-2940
12/07/1950
Application for Writ of Error
HAROLD E. CRAWFORD
DETERING COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/29/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/02/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/16/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
12/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1951Response to Motion filed
03/29/1951Additional Copies received
03/29/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/21/1951Motion to supplement filed
03/14/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
03/14/1951Opinion issued
02/02/1951Supplemental Brief filed
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
12/16/1950Response to Petition
12/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/07/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harold E. CrawfordPetitioner
Detering Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information