Case: 01-01-00304-CR
01-01-00304-CR
03/28/2001
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Bustamante, Eddie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/2003 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |||||
07/12/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |||||
06/27/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
06/17/2002 | Submitted | | |||||
06/03/2002 | Reset submission date | | |||||
05/20/2002 | Oral argument has been waived | | |||||
02/14/2002 | Brief Due | | |||||
02/14/2002 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |||||
02/14/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/14/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/13/2002 | Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |||||
01/15/2002 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |||||
01/15/2002 | Extension to file brief disposed-brief here | Grant motion | | ||||
12/27/2001 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
12/19/2001 | Brief Due | | |||||
11/19/2001 | Brief Due | | |||||
10/29/2001 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||||
10/26/2001 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
10/18/2001 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | | ||||
08/31/2001 | Brief Due | | |||||
08/10/2001 | Reporters Record Due (Statement of Facts) | | |||||
08/01/2001 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||||
07/16/2001 | Request for time to file reporter's record disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/05/2001 | Request filed for additional time to file reporter's record | | |||||
07/02/2001 | Reporters Record Due (Statement of Facts) | | |||||
05/31/2001 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | | ||||
04/17/2001 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||||
04/17/2001 | Request to file clerk's record granted and record is here | Grant motion | | ||||
04/16/2001 | Record due | | |||||
04/12/2001 | Request for time to file clerk's record filed | | |||||
03/28/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||||
02/15/2001 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |||||
02/15/2001 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/29/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BUSTAMANTE, EDDIE | Criminal - Appellant | Gary Michael Polland |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Kelly Ann Smith |
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable L. L. FULLER
832125
45 Yrs TDC