judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-2948
A-2948
12/11/1950
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
ROBERT D. GOODRICH
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/05/1951Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/30/1951Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
03/21/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/28/1951Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
01/26/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/11/1950Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/05/1951Response to Brief filed
03/30/1951Brief in Support of Petition
03/26/1951Response to Motion filed
03/21/1951Motion for Rehearing
03/07/1951Opinion issued
01/28/1951Brief on the Merits
01/26/1951Brief on the Merits
12/11/1950Certified Question filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANYRespondent
Robert D. GoodrichPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information