judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RENNER VS. LUCKY PUMPING CONCRETE

Case Information: 31271
Short Caption:RENNER VS. LUCKY PUMPING CONCRETECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A358457Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/30/1997 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Filing fee of $200 (Jan Paul Koch--check no. 6856).
10/28/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/30/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/12/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
11/13/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to file Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
11/25/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Received certified copy of Case Appeal Statement.
02/19/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
02/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court.
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a) (1).
04/15/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. NRAP 9(a) certificate of No Transcript Request.
06/08/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 6/7/99.)
06/08/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
07/02/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent, Lucky Pumping Concrete, Inc.'s, Motion and Order that Respondent shall have to and including August 9, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
08/06/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 8/5/99).
08/06/1999Other Other. Filed Respondent's Addendum to Joint Appendix.
08/31/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 8/30/99.)
05/10/2000Other Other. Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Cohen, Johnson, Day, Jones & Royal, and Steven L. Day in place and stead of Stephenson & Dickinson as counsel for respondents.
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20554
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB).
02/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "We hereby reverse the district court's order striking the request for a trial de novo and remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this corder." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB. 01-02502
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02585
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02585