judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARGOT BELDEN and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC v. JOHN THORKILDSEN and STACY THORKILDSEN, his wife

Case Heading (06-112)
Case Number:06-112Case Docketed On:05/22/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Uniform Commercial Code (Title 34.1)
Short Title:MARGOT BELDEN and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC v. JOHN THORKILDSEN and STACY THORKILDSEN, his wife
Full Title:MARGOT BELDEN and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. JOHN THORKILDSEN and STACY THORKILDSEN, his wife, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMargot BeldenRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppellantFish Creek Design, LLCRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeJohn ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeStacy ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 68
Citation:156 P.3d 320

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/12/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/25/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
09/11/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
09/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/26/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/29/2006Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re designation of entire record by counsel for appellees. Advised her to send a letter and not to send record until instructed.EventPhone CallFinal
10/02/2006Correspondence - Incoming from District Court Clerk regarding Appellees' designation of entire record on appeal.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/03/2006Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
10/09/2006Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee re sanction. He is out of the country and unable to pay sanction or file designation. Told him we would post an extension after his return and call the District Court Clerk and advise her of situation.EventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2006Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
11/09/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/14/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Heather Noble for appellants; David G. Lewis for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/14/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/26/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order; Justice Burke writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/14/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/14/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal