judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAWRENCE A. MONACO V. D.C. BOARD OF ZONING ADJUSTMENT

Case Information: 81-AA-1636
Short Caption:LAWRENCE A. MONACO V. D.C. BOARD OF ZONING ADJUSTMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Of Zoning Adjustment (BZA)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/31/1981

Opening Event Date:12/31/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/23/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/01/1982
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Whayne R. QuinYN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Lawrence A. Monaco YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Lutz Alexander Prager YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MONACO, LAWRENCE A. JR. BZA
12/31/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/23/1982FiledRecord Completed
07/01/1982FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/19/1988LETTER SENT TO APPEAL COORDINATOR & ATTORNEY'S RETURNING EXHIBITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD