Case Heading (S-18-0052) | |||||
Parent: | S-18-0051 | Case Docketed On: | 02/28/2018 | ||
Consolidated: | S-18-0052 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Johnson County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34) | ||
Short Title: | J. MICHAELA BYRNES v. JOHNSON COUNTY COMMISSIONERS; JOHNSON COUNTY ROAD AND BRIDGE; and STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION | ||||
Full Title: | J. MICHAELA BYRNES, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JOHNSON COUNTY COMMISSIONERS; JOHNSON COUNTY ROAD AND BRIDGE; and STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | J. Michaela Byrnes | Pro Se |
Appellee | Johnson County Commissioners | Richard Rideout Barry Vincent Crago |
Appellee | Johnson County Road and Bridge | Richard Rideout Barry Vincent Crago |
Appellee | Department of Transportation | Peter K. Michael Daniel E. White Jeremy Alan Gross |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
02/28/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
02/28/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
02/28/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/02/2018 | Order - Consolidating cases | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
03/05/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
03/12/2018 | Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Boomgaarden is recused | Notice-Internal | Recusal memo | Final | |
03/13/2018 | Order Dismissing Appeals | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
03/29/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |