Case Information: 38979 | |||
Short Caption: | HAMAMOTO VS. YOKOI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A433260 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/08/2002 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/24/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Ronald J. Von Felden--check no. 5822. | ||
12/24/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-21628 | |
12/31/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Petition for Emergency Stay of Order Granting Specific Performance for the Sale of Real Property. | 01-21875 | |
01/03/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 02-00141 | |
01/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Apellant, Hamamoto's Petition for Emergency Stay. | 02-00210 | |
01/08/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/08/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Copy of docketing statement mailed to settlement judge.) | 02-00452 | |
02/08/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Denying Motion for Stay and Order to Show Cause. The emergency motion for a stay is denied. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. | 02-02589 | |
03/07/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss by Appellant for Lack of Jurisdiction. | 02-04154 | |
03/28/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On February 8, 2002, we ordered appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. In response to our show cause order, appellant has acknowledged the jurisdictional defect, and has moved to dismiss the appeal. We grant the motion, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[In light of this order, we vacate the notice of settlement conference issued January 8, 2002.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-05469 | |
03/28/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |