Case Information: 38974 | |||
Short Caption: | PECK VS. U.S. BANK OF NEVADA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0005134 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt, Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/10/2002 / Susich, J. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/24/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson. | ||
12/24/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson. | ||
12/24/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Jeffrey A. Dickerson--check no. 6993. | ||
12/24/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-21599 | |
01/08/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-00473 | |
01/10/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: J. Thomas Susich. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/14/2002 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement conference is set for February 27, 2002. | 02-02963 | |
02/28/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 02-03729 | |
02/28/2002 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 02-03730 | |
02/28/2002 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 02-03731 | |
03/11/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 02-04305 | |
03/11/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |