judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS (LEROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38994
Short Caption:LEWIS (LEROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178929Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/31/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/31/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-21903
01/02/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed on 12/27/01. Due Date: 10 days
01/09/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on: December 27, 2001. 02-00616
01/24/2002Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. fn2[All filing deadlines shall run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court.] 02-01642
02/15/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Certified copy of notice from Clark County Clerk filed in district court on 2/11/02 enclosing a copy of minute order. Christopher Oram appointed as counsel for appellant on 02-03048
04/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We elect to treat the district court's Notice of appointment of Counsel filed in this court on February 11, 2002, as a notice of appearance by Mr. Oram. The clerk of this court shall modify this court's docket to reflect that Mr. Oram is counsel of record for appellant. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 20 days to file and serve the docketing statement; 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 02-06650
05/09/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-08136
06/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 8, 2002, this court received an untimely transcript request form and the clerk requested counsel to file a motion for permission to file the late transcript request form. To date, a motion for permission has not been received. We direct the clerk of this court to file the transcript request form received on May 8, 2002. 02-10266
06/13/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/22/01 and 12/10/01. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 02-08046
08/12/2002Order/Procedural Order. Court Recorder Tina Smith shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcript for the proceedings conducted on October 22, 2001 and December 10, 2001, file a motion requesting an extension of time to complete the preparation of this transcript, or notify this court in writing that the requested transcript cannot be produced. 02-13749
08/13/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: September 13, 2002. 02-13829
08/16/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 22, 2001. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 02-14063
09/16/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. 02-16062
10/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement the motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit. We suspend the briefing schedule for this case pending further order of this court. 02-17102
10/28/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) 02-18482
10/28/2002AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-18484
11/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 28, 2002. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix submitted provisionally on October 28, 2002. In an affidavit attached to the motion, appellant's counsel Christopher Oram has advised this court that appellant no longer wishes to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. Therefore, we deny as moot appellant's previous motion of September 16, 2002, to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. 02-19062
11/05/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 10/24/02. 02-18483
11/05/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-18484
11/27/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on Express-No postmark. 02-20487
12/24/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 3, 2003. 02-22011
02/11/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the reply brief. Appellant shall, within 10 days, file and serve the reply brief. Failure to file a timely reply brief may be treated as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. 03-02371
02/24/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 03-03003
03/31/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-05279
03/31/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/08/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-07810
06/03/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-07903
06/03/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/25/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 6, 2003. 03-07903