Case Information: 38986 | |||
Short Caption: | BYRD (BART) VS. DISTRICT COURT (ATTORNEY GENERAL) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Habeas Corpus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/27/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/27/2001 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Ex Parte Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to Nevada Constitutional Articles. | 01-21761 | |
01/22/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-01355 | |
02/13/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On January 17, 2002, this court received several proper person documents. On January 22, 2002, this court denied appellant's petition for a writ of habeas corpus. No good cause appearing, this court denies the relief requested in the documents received on January 17, 2002. | 02-02870 | |
02/19/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 02-01556 | |
02/19/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |