judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HUTCHINSON, LARRY GILBERT UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-1465
Short Caption:HUTCHINSON, LARRY GILBERT UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8833-83Filed Date:11/23/1983

Opening Event Date:11/23/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/14/1985
Argued/Submitted:05/01/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Diane K. Dildine YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mona C. Mack YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUTCHINSON, LARRY GILBERT UNITED STATES
11/23/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/05/1984FiledRecord Completed
01/14/1985FiledBriefing Completed
05/01/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/31/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition