STATE OF INDIANA VS ALISA D ROLLINS | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Rollins, Alisa D | Female White | ||
C/O Brian Chadwell 6821 State Road 1 Spencerville, IN 46788 | ||||
Public Defender | Public Defender | |||
Thompson Smith Po Box 686 Auburn, IN 46706 | ||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | |||
Charges: Rollins, Alisa D | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | DOMESTIC BATTERY | 35-42-2-1.3 | Misdemeanor Class A | 09/08/2007 | |
09/10/2007 | Converted Event Criminal action filed charging the Defendant with the offense of Domestic Battery, a Class A Misdemeanor. State files Appearance. Parties appear for initial hearing. Defendant requests appointment of Public Defender. Court finds Defendant to be indigent and appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant. Preliminary plea of not guilty entered on behalf of Defendant and omnibus/pre-trial hearing set for November 29, 2007, at 11:00 A.M. Bond set in sum of $1,000.00 cash or surety. No Contact Order is entered as a condition of bail.- (RJO) | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2007 | Converted Event Surety bond posted.- | ||||||
09/11/2007 | Judgment (Judicial Officer: Wallace, Kevin P) 1. DOMESTIC BATTERY Conversion Unknown | ||||||
09/12/2007 | Converted Event Mark S. Olivero, Deputy Public Defender, files Appearance on behalf of the Defendant. Defendant files Motion for Discovery and Demand for Jury Trial. | ||||||
09/25/2007 | Converted Event State of Indiana files Motion for Discovery. | ||||||
10/25/2007 | Converted Event State of Indiana files Notice of Service of Discovery. | ||||||
11/29/2007 | Converted Event Parties appear. Jury trial set June 26, 2008, at 8:30 A.M. (Second Setting) Final pre-trial conference set May 1, 2008, at 9:00 A.M. | ||||||
05/01/2008 | Converted Event Parties appear for final pre-trial conference. No negotiated plea is reached. Trial will go as scheduled June 26, 2008, at 8:30 A.M. | ||||||
06/25/2008 | Converted Event Parties file Pre-Trial Diversion Agreement. | ||||||
07/17/2009 | Motion to Dismiss Filed
| ||||||
07/17/2009 | Order Granting Motion to Dismiss (RJO) OFF DOCKET
|
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
17D01-0709-CM-00716 | Rollins, Alisa D | 09/10/2007 DeKalb Superior Court 1 | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|