judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2915
A-2915
11/09/1950
Application for Writ of Error
WOOD MOTOR COMPANY, INCORPORATED
C. W. NEBEL, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
02/19/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/29/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/09/1950Response to Reply filedRespondent
12/05/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/28/1950Errata FiledPetitioner
11/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/20/1961Miscellaneous letter
11/15/1951Response to Petition
04/04/1951Opinion issued
02/19/1951Supplemental Brief filed
01/31/1951Submission reset
01/29/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
12/09/1950Response to Reply filed
12/05/1950Reply to Response
11/28/1950Errata Filed
11/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/09/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wood Motor Company, IncorporatedPetitioner
C. W. Nebel, Jr., et al.Respondent
Thompson, Knight, Wright, Wrisberg and Simmons, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information