judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOUD, JAMES F DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 83-CO-0120
Short Caption:DOUD, JAMES F DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:N424-79Filed Date:01/21/1983

Opening Event Date:01/21/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/18/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/30/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charles A. Kubinski NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOUD, JAMES F IN RE: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/21/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/18/1983FiledRecord Completed
08/30/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition