Case: B-6792
B-6792
05/24/1977
Application for Writ of Error
L. D. BOUNDS
CHERYL KAY CAUDLE AND KERRY TYRONE CAUDLE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/27/1977 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
12/14/1977 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/09/1977 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
11/14/1977 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/23/1977 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/24/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
05/24/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/1978 | Letter Filed | | ||
05/25/1978 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/30/1978 | Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/27/1978 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/26/1978 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/25/1978 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/27/1977 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/14/1977 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/14/1977 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
12/09/1977 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/09/1977 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
12/07/1977 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/30/1977 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/14/1977 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
07/27/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/27/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/27/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/23/1977 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/09/1977 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
05/24/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/24/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/24/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
L. D. Bounds | Petitioner | |
John H. Holloway | Amicus Curiae | |
Cheryl Kay Caudle and Kerry Tyrone Caudle | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information