Case Heading (S-20-0241) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0241 | Case Docketed On: | 11/05/2020 | ||
Linked To: | S-20-0240 | ||||
Status: | Set (03/17/2021) | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33) | ||
Short Title: | THOR HALLINGBYE, M.D., ex rel. WYOMING BOARD OF MEDICINE v. REBECCA PAINTER, M.D. | ||||
Full Title: | THOR HALLINGBYE, M.D., ex rel. WYOMING BOARD OF MEDICINE, Appellant (Respondent), v. REBECCA PAINTER, M.D., Appellee (Petitioner). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Thor Hallingbye M.D. | William G. Hibbler |
Appellee | Rebecca Painter M.D. | Stephen H. Kline |
- Pending Ticklers |
Tickler Due Date | Original Due Date | Status | Title | Comments |
02/24/2021 | 02/24/2021 | Open | Record due | |
Docket Entry: | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Administrative Law and Procedure, Other |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/05/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/05/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/05/2020 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/05/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/18/2020 | Brief - Appellant and Appellant's Statement of Transcript Costs Pursuant to W.R.A.P., 10.01 | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/21/2020 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (Respondent) and thumb drive with appendix, which was uploaded to the original brief. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/23/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellant in S-20-0241) | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
01/28/2021 | Event - Phone Call from Kline Law Office - appendix documents are exactly the same documents that were provided to appellant's brief (and Kline's brief in S-20-0240). To avoid unnecessary duplication, they will reference them in their brief but will not be uploading and serving them again. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
02/01/2021 | Brief - Appellee (attachments were included on Brief of Appellant filed in S-20-0240) | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
02/01/2021 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response Brief of Appellee (Petitioner) and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/02/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Notice of case maturity | Notice-Outgoing | Notice of case maturity | Final | |
02/16/2021 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
02/17/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final |