Case: 05-97-02144-CR
05-97-02144-CR
12/11/1997
All Misdemeanors
McBride, Jr., David
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/17/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/17/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/26/1998 | Supplemental Record Due | | |||
10/09/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
10/09/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
10/02/1998 | Case reinstated |
| |||
10/02/1998 | Order Entered | | |||
10/02/1998 | Submitted | | |||
10/02/1998 | Case reinstated | | |||
10/02/1998 | Submission | | |||
10/02/1998 | Submitted | | |||
09/30/1998 | Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed | | |||
09/30/1998 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
09/09/1998 | Letter Received | | |||
08/27/1998 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
08/27/1998 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
04/27/1998 | Notice To Appellant that Brief is late | | |||
03/02/1998 | Notice to Parties Reporter's Record Not Paid | | |||
02/24/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
02/11/1998 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |||
02/06/1998 | Record due | | |||
02/03/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
12/11/1997 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
12/11/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
12/11/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
12/05/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
10/10/1997 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
10/09/1997 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/17/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Trish Phillips | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Trisha Phillips |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Sue Korioth |
David Mcbride, Jr. | Criminal - Appellant | David Mcbride, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 6
Dallas
Honorable Philip S. Barker
MA97-75027-G
180 Days/24 Mos Prob/$1000