Case Heading (S-20-0257) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0257 | Case Docketed On: | 11/30/2020 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief | ||
Short Title: | KARMEN SHAW v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | KARMEN SHAW, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Petitioner | Karmen Shaw | Robert T. Moxley |
Respondent | The State of Wyoming | Bridget L. Hill Jenny Lynn Craig Timothy Paul Zintak Joshua Charles Eames |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/30/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/30/2020 | Petition - Writ - review | Petition | Writ - review | Final | |
11/30/2020 | Motion - In forma pauperis | Motion | In forma pauperis | Final | |
12/03/2020 | Response/Objection - Petition for review | Response/Objection | Petition for review | Final | |
12/04/2020 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of Review | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/22/2020 | Order Granting Petition for Writ of Review (Reversing the District Court's "Order on Appeal") | Order | Petition for review - grant | Final | |
12/22/2020 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/04/2021 | Combined Petition for Rehearing and Brief/Petition for Writ of Certiorari | Petition | Rehearing | Final | |
01/26/2021 | Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Order Denying Petition for Writ of Certiorari | Order | Petition for rehearing - deny | Final | |
01/26/2021 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |