Case Information: 39073 | |||
Short Caption: | FERRADINO VS. STATE, BUSINESS & INDUSTRY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35759 , 37866 , 37868 , 37871 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A412844 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/25/2002 / Kummer, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hunterton & Associates--check no. 16461. | ||
01/14/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-00925 | |
01/25/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Kummer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/01/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-02144 | |
02/01/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Thomas F. Kummer. (Docketing statement) | ||
02/11/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 5, 2002. | 02-02707 | |
08/08/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (Filed and signed by counsel for appellant and respondents). | 02-13552 | |
08/23/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the joint motion of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 02-14509 | |
08/23/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |