judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD E. PINTHER v. JAMES D. DITZEL

Case Heading (06-231)
Case Number:06-231Case Docketed On:10/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:RONALD E. PINTHER v. JAMES D. DITZEL
Full Title:RONALD E. PINTHER, Appellant (Defendant), v. JAMES D. DITZEL, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald E. PintherDonald Eugene Miller
AppelleeJames D. DitzelTerry Wynn Connolly

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 116
Citation:163 P.3d 816

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/11/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/29/2006Brief - Appellant - (timely filed per administrative order regarding Supreme Court move)BriefAppellantFinal
12/07/2006Event - Phone Call - Office of counsel for appellant re service copy of brief. Brief not picked up, file stamped cover page mailed to counsel, remaining pages discarded. Counsel said brief has not been served. Advised to send copy, file an amended certificate of service.EventPhone CallFinal
12/07/2006Service - Certificate of service - amended - brief of appellantServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
01/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/12/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/24/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke (Donald E. Miller for appellant; Terry W. Connolly for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/27/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/06/2007Motion - Fees and costs - pleading not styled as a motion, but submitted as suchMotionFees and costsFinal
08/28/2007Order - Other - Costs on ReversalOrderOtherFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/27/2007Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellee and requested certification that costs have been paid pursuant to the order awarding costs on reversal of 8/28/07. Mr. Connelly will send certification.EventPhone CallFinal
09/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Appellee certification of remittance of costs.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal