judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCNEIL, JOHN UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0175
Short Caption:MCNEIL, JOHN UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2326-80Filed Date:01/21/1981

Opening Event Date:01/21/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/12/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/02/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/19/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jerry L. Dier YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Donald J. Allison YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCNEIL, JOHN UNITED STATES
01/21/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1982FiledRecord Completed
11/02/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/19/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition