judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6777
B-6777
05/18/1977
Application for Writ of Error
FLORENCE C. HOWELL
CITY OF DALLAS, DALLAS COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/23/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/26/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
05/18/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/27/1977Response to Motion filed
06/23/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/26/1977Response to Petition
05/25/1977Response to Petition
05/18/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/18/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Florence C. HowellPetitioner
Dallas CountyRespondent
City of DallasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information