judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MEWBORN, ELBA L. US LIFE CREDIT CORPORATION

Case Information: 83-CV-0100
Short Caption:MEWBORN, ELBA L. US LIFE CREDIT CORPORATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:01/13/1983

Opening Event Date:01/13/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/04/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/18/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/21/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William E. Potts, Jr.NY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Andra Barmash Greene YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Courtenay Ellis NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael J. Fradkin YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Murray I. Resnick NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MEWBORN, ELBA L. US LIFE CREDIT CORPORATION
01/13/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/04/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/18/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/21/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/15/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition