Case Heading (S-20-0217) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0217 | Case Docketed On: | 10/26/2020 | ||
Status: | Brief Only/Under Advisement | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | MICHAEL SCOTT CARROLL, II v. MIRANDA CHRISTINE GIBSON | ||||
Full Title: | MICHAEL SCOTT CARROLL, II, Appellant (Petitioner), v. MIRANDA CHRISTINE GIBSON, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Michael Scott Carroll II | Pro Se |
Appellee | Miranda Christine Gibson | Pro Se |
Intervenor | Department of Family Services | Bridget L. Hill Misha Westby Jill E. Kucera Wendy Susan Ross |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Support, Constitutional Law |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/26/2020 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
10/26/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/26/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/26/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/26/2020 | Order Regarding Service to Appellee | Order | Other | Final | |
11/30/2020 | Brief - Appellant (does not have final order attached). | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/30/2020 | Appellant's brief forwarded to requested address. Email sent to Ms. Gibson regarding the same. | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
01/11/2021 | Brief - Intervenor (State) | Brief | Intervenor | Final | |
01/11/2021 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Wyoming Attorney General Regarding Appellant's Claim of Unconstitutionality; and received copy of designation of record for Wyoming Attorney General | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/11/2021 | State's Brief, filed Jan 11, was forwarded to Ms. Gibson by email. | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
01/12/2021 | Failure to File - Brief of appellee (Ms. Gibson) | Failure to File | Brief of appellee | Final | |
01/13/2021 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
01/21/2021 | Appellant's Motion to Strike Brief of Wyoming Attorney General | Motion | Strike | Final | |
01/21/2021 | Event - Phone Call to AG's office, let Jennifer E. know that Mr. Carroll filed a Motion to Strike | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/21/2021 | Appellant's Motion to Strike forwarded to Ms. Gibson | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
01/28/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/02/2021 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
02/03/2021 | Response of the Wyoming Attorney General to Appellant's Motion to Strike Brief of Wyoming Attorney General | Response/Objection | Motion | Final | |
02/03/2021 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response of the Wyoming Attorney General to Appellant's Motion to Strike Brief of Wyoming Attorney General | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/08/2021 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/17/2021 | Order Denying Motion to Strike | Order | Deny | Final |