judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUGAN VS. GOTSOPOULOS

Case Information: 32187
Short Caption:DUGAN VS. GOTSOPOULOSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A351989Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/24/1998 / Zucker, CarolSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/29/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Needham Injury Lawyers--check no. 9191.
04/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
04/24/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Carol Zucker. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/04/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/22/1998Other Other. Filed Status Report.
11/12/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
01/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
02/18/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 01/12/98 through 01/15/98. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson.
03/08/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson.
03/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings dated January 13, 1998 and January 14, 1998. Court Reporter: Debra Winn.
06/01/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 5/28/99).
06/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
06/07/1999Other Other. Filed Receipt of Copy (Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix).
07/02/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent's shall have to and including July 12, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
07/13/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 7/12/99).
08/12/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 8/10/99).
12/15/1999Other Other. Filed Appellant's Supplement to Opening Brief. (Supplemental authority). (OK per SJ)
10/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 11, 2000 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
11/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Oral Argument before Southern Panel/Las Vegas. 00-20370
11/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. On October 30, 2000, this court issued a notice scheduling this appeal for oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel in Carson City, Nevada, on December 11, 2000, at 11:30 a.m. We have determined that oral argument is not necessary. We hereby vacate the oral argument scheduled for this appeal. This case shall be submitted upon the briefs, appendices and papers filed herein. On November 20, 2000, appellant file a motion requesting that the oral argument for the appeal be rescheduled. Because we have determined that oral argument will not be held for this appeal, we deny appellant's motion as moot. 00-20874
11/29/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Panel: NNP00A-MS/DA/ML
05/07/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Shearing, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. NNP00A 01-07536
06/04/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08023
06/04/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 6, 2001. 01-08023