judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GUILLERMO MARQUEZ-GUITIERREZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-117)
Case Number:06-117Case Docketed On:05/31/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:GUILLERMO MARQUEZ-GUITIERREZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GUILLERMO MARQUEZ-GUITIERREZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGuillermo Marquez-GuitierrezD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 155
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/31/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/01/2006Correspondence - Incoming from Court Reporter; certifying transcripts have been filed with district court.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/05/2006Correspondence - Incoming from Court Reporter; motion hearing had not been transcribed with the others, but has not been filed in the district court. No action necessaryCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/15/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
12/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/15/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Cassette Tape; Volume III, Transcripts, Pre-Sentence Investigation Report and VHS tapes (2).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, RehurekNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, Appellate Counsel, PDP for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/26/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/12/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/30/2007Event - Phone Call. Called the Clerk's office. We never received the green certified card back. She stated that they had the mandate and the files.EventPhone CallFinal
11/02/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/15/07 by C. Roybal. Post office in Laramie mailed this to us.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal