judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00415-CR
04-81-00415-CR
11/13/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Vega, Raymond Hernandez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/25/1984Mandate Issued
05/25/1984Mandate Issued
05/24/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
05/21/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
01/26/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/24/1984Petition for Review Filed
01/19/1984Mot. EOT t/f Pet. for Disc. Review DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1984Mot. EOT t/f Pet. for Disc. Review Filed
12/19/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/15/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/15/1983Motion f/l/file Exhibits DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/1983Motion f/l/file Exhibits Filed
07/13/1983Submission
07/13/1983Submitted
02/08/1982Case ready to be set
02/08/1982Brief Filed
02/08/1982Case ready to be set
01/08/1982Brief Filed
12/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
12/08/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/04/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/13/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/10/1981Record Approved
09/16/1981Record Filed
06/18/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
80-CR-3018
Eight (8) years