Case Information: 33980 | |||
Short Caption: | MOZZER (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123203 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/24/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
04/02/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/02/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-02452 | |
04/08/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 3/8/99; Notice of Entry of Order filed 3/8/99. Due Date: 10 days | ||
04/15/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 03/08/99. | 99-02928 | |
04/15/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 03/08/99. | 99-02930 | |
05/19/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 33939, 33947, 33980, 33982, 33984, 34000, 34038. | 99-04102 | |
08/24/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 99-07883 | |
08/24/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/21/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/DA | 00-12614 | |
08/16/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14269 | |
08/16/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/20/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. | 00-14269 |