judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00417-CV
04-81-00417-CV
11/13/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Vick, Jack V.
George, Elton and Leslie
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/18/1986Mandate Issued
03/18/1986Mandate Issued
03/17/1986Case Returned from Higher Court
01/29/1986Higher Court DecisionRefused
10/16/1985Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/01/1985Writ of Error filed
09/03/1985Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/08/1985Response to Motion Filed
07/30/1985Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/26/1985Verification Filed
07/19/1985Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
07/12/1985Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/28/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1985Appeal Reinstated
03/21/1985Case Returned from Higher Court
03/21/1985Case remanded from higher court
03/21/1985Submission
03/21/1985Submitted
03/18/1985Order Entered
12/19/1984Order Entered
06/04/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/29/1984Writ of Error filed
05/29/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/18/1984Writ of Error filed
04/19/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/19/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/04/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/04/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/20/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/20/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/16/1983Submission
02/16/1983Submission
02/16/1983Submitted
01/10/1983Submission Letter Sent
04/26/1982Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/15/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/13/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/09/1982Brief Filed
04/09/1982Case ready to be set
04/06/1982Brief Filed
03/30/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1982Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
03/23/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/23/1982No Description Available.
03/23/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/23/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/15/1982No Description Available.
03/15/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
03/01/1982Brief Filed
02/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/29/1982No Description Available.
01/25/1982No Description Available.
01/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/04/1982No Description Available.
12/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/09/1981Response to Motion Filed
12/08/1981Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1981Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/03/1981Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
11/20/1981Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
11/13/1981No Description Available.
11/13/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/20/1981Appeal Bond Filed
09/23/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/18/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann
78-CI-18397