judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00416-CR
04-81-00416-CR
11/13/1981
Robbery
Hernandez, Tranquillino Rios
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/20/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
09/20/1983Mandate Issued
09/20/1983Mandate Issued
07/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/13/1983Submission
07/13/1983Submission
07/13/1983Submitted
11/15/1982Argument Letter Sent
01/07/1982Case ready to be set
01/07/1982Brief Filed
01/07/1982Case ready to be set
12/09/1981Brief Filed
11/13/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/10/1981Record Approved
09/16/1981Record Filed
07/10/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
81-CR-1144
Twenty (20) years