Case Information: 33983 | |||
Short Caption: | AGUIAR (FRANCO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C70353 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/02/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-02457 | |
04/05/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 02/24/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: James Helleso. | 99-02543 | |
04/07/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-02597 | |
04/14/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-02911 | |
04/14/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Appendix. | 99-02912 | |
05/03/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. | 99-03487 | |
05/05/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The twelve-page fast track response submitted on may 3, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. | 99-03591 | |
05/05/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-03486 | |
05/10/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike/Correct Fast Track Response. | 99-03715 | |
06/10/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." FN2[We hereby deny, as moot, appellant's motion to strike/correct the fast track response]. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-04954 | |
07/07/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-06008 | |
07/07/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/19/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 14, 1999. | 99-06008 |