judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01300-CR
05-81-01300-CR
11/13/1981
Other Drug Sale
Nickerson, Michael Don
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2018Order enteredDestroy
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
01/05/1984Mandate IssuedAffirmed
03/07/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1982Submitted
07/21/1982Brief Filed
06/21/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/21/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/22/1982Brief Filed
03/08/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/08/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/13/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Ron Chapman
F80-22430-MH
2 Years TDC