judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

POWELL, WYLIE CARDINAL LIGHTING COMPANY INC

Case Information: 85-CV-1058
Short Caption:POWELL, WYLIE CARDINAL LIGHTING COMPANY INCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14094-84Filed Date:07/29/1985

Opening Event Date:07/29/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/03/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/09/1986
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael M. Hicks YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
A. Thomas Carroccio YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Edward J. Smith YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POWELL, WYLIE ET AL CARDINAL LIGHTING COMPANY INC
07/29/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/03/1986FiledRecord Completed
07/09/1986FiledBriefing Completed
11/13/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/25/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition