judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01219-CR
05-81-01219-CR
11/13/1981
Murder
Anthony George Green
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/1984Mandate IssuedAffirmed
10/09/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/21/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/21/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/20/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1982Submitted
09/01/1982Brief Filed
07/07/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/08/1982Brief Filed
06/01/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/25/1982Supplemental Record Filed
04/29/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/25/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/18/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/1984Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Green, Anthony GeorgeCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
f81-7691-nk
15 yrs tdc