Case Information: 34680 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON VS. THOMPSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366853 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/31/1999 / Galatz, Neil | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/05/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/18/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Allstate--check no. 73428617. | ||
08/18/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-07695 | |
08/18/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
08/30/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 8/23/99. | 99-08103 | |
08/31/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Neil Galatz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/15/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-12695 | |
01/13/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a) and file a docketing statement; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 00-00620 | |
01/21/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-00984 | |
01/26/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (No return envelope provided.) | 00-01283 | |
05/08/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Airborne Express, No postmark. STRICKEN BY ORDER 06/27/00. | 00-07460 | |
05/08/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. STRICKEN BY ORDER 06/27/00. | 00-07461 | |
05/26/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/23/00. | 00-08939 | |
06/06/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Permission to File Reply Brief. | 00-09504 | |
06/06/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. | 00-09561 | |
06/19/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 10(A). | 00-10467 | |
06/27/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's motion to strike. The clerk of this court shall forthwith strike appellants' joint appendix and opening brief which were filed on May 8, 2000. Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended appendix and an amended opening brief. Because NRAP 31(a)(1) provides that an appellant may file a reply brief within thirty days after service of the answering brief, we deny as moot appellants' motion of June 6, 2000, requesting permission to file a reply brief. | 00-10988 | |
09/06/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, appellants have not filed a motion to file the late brief and appendix. Nevertheless, in the interest of judicial efficiency, we direct the clerk of this court to file the brief and joint appendix provisionally submitted on July 19, 2000. Although we decline to impose sanctions at this time, we caution counsel for appellants that further derelictions in the prosecution of this appeal may result in the imposition of sanctions. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief. fn1[Respondent's answering brief was filed on May 26, 2000.] | 00-15639 | |
09/06/2000 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (Attached proof of service to the end of this brief-Document No. 00-12508.) | 00-12507 | |
09/06/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Amended Joint Appendix. (Attached acceptance of Amended Joint Appendix to the end of this Appendix-Document No. 00-12510.) | 00-12509 | |
12/05/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | 00-21264 | |
12/05/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/11/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-11729 | |
08/07/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-11970 | |
08/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. | 01-11970 |