judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH ALLAN LEYVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-233)
Case Number:06-233Case Docketed On:10/12/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:KEITH ALLAN LEYVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEITH ALLAN LEYVA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith Allan LeyvaDiane M. Lozano
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 136
Citation:165 P.3d 446

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/12/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/11/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/26/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
04/10/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk MorganNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/03/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Orignal Papers; Volume II, Confidential File; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting PaulingNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal