Case Information: 80-FM-1260 | |||
Short Caption: | SWINSON, M.E. BYRD, S.E. | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Other Family |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | P259-77 | Filed Date: | 11/03/1980 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/03/1980 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/31/1980 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 10/15/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/01/1982 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SWINSON, M.E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA EX REL BYRD, S.E. | |||
11/03/1980 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/31/1980 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
10/15/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
12/01/1982 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/23/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |