Case Information: 35420 | |||
Short Caption: | GELT MANAGEMENT CONTROL VS.YOUNG ELECTRIC SIGN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A361445 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/11/2000 / Smith, Jay | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/09/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/30/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Foley & Jones--check no. 10522. | ||
12/30/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-13429 | |
01/11/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/24/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 00-06554 | |
04/24/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
05/03/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 00-07228 | |
05/11/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-07805 | |
07/27/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why theis appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. | 00-13014 | |
08/14/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 23, 1999. To Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. | 00-14170 | |
09/11/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: July 21, 1999 and July 22, 1999. Court Reporter: Sherry Robinson. | 00-15963 | |
10/10/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On September 11, 2000, court reporter Sherry Robinson filed certified copies of transcripts for proceedings held on July 21, 1000, and July 22, 1999. The district court records indicate that no proceedings were held on July 23, 1999. Unless informed otherwise by appellant by a writing filed in this court within 10 days from the date of this order, we will deem all necessary transcripts to have been filed with this court. To date, appellant has not filed the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall file the opening brief and appendix within ten days from the date of this order or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. | 00-17879 | |
10/24/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/20/00. | 00-18808 | |
10/24/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 00-18809 | |
11/22/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 19, 2000. | 00-20579 | |
12/21/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: No postmark. | 00-22254 | |
01/25/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 22, 2001. | 01-01640 | |
02/26/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 02/22/01. | 01-03531 | |
07/09/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 01-11448 | |
07/09/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. SNP02-CY/DA/ML. | ||
11/09/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-18804 | |
12/05/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-19165 | |
12/05/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. | 01-19165 |