judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00428-CR
04-81-00428-CR
11/16/1981
Other Felony
Roper, Oscar Leo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/27/1982Mandate Issued
01/27/1982Mandate Issued
12/23/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/16/1981Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/11/1981Brief Filed
11/16/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/13/1981Record Approved
08/10/1981Record Filed
05/14/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
80-CR-3531
2 to 6 years