Case Information: 35434 | |||
Short Caption: | BAUSTISTA-MORA (CARLOS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3371 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/04/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-00079 | |
01/19/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: January 12, 2000. | 00-00830 | |
02/24/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. | 00-02920 | |
02/24/2000 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. | 00-02921 | |
02/28/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-03123 | |
03/13/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Response. | 00-03946 | |
03/13/2000 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Respondent's Fast Track Appendix on Appeal. | 00-03947 | |
03/13/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal and Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Fast Track Statement. | 00-05634 | |
04/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on February 24, 2000. | 00-05294 | |
04/03/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-02920 | |
04/03/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 00-02921 | |
04/03/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-03946 | |
04/03/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 00-03947 | |
05/10/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On April 3, 2000, the State filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. We deny the State's motion to dismiss.] Young, J. and Leavitt, J. I dissent: Agosti, J. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-07766 | |
06/01/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Rehearing. | 00-09255 | |
07/13/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." Young, J. and Leavitt, J. I concur: Agosti, J. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-12034 | |
07/21/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 00-12660 | |
07/31/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13165 | |
07/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/08/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2000. REMITTITUR RECALLED 11/21/00. | 00-13165 | |
11/21/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration, Recalling Remittitur and Remanding. This is a petition for en banc reconsideration of the panel's decision. We have reviewed appellant's petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the pane;'s decision is warranted. fn1[We recall the remittitur previously issued on July 31, 2000.] " . . . we remand this matter to the district court with instructions to vacate appellant's sentence and hold a new sentencing hearing before a different district court judge." We further order the Nye County District Attorney to specifically perform the plea bargain agreement. En Banc-RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB | 00-20479 | |
12/19/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-20776 | |
12/19/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2000. | 00-20776 |