judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00835-CR
01-81-00835-CR
11/17/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Fuentes, Angel
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/18/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/17/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
01/25/1984No description available.Refused
10/13/1983Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/11/1983No description available.
09/15/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/01/1983Motion for rehearing filed
09/01/1983Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
08/05/1983Motion to substitute counsel
07/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1982Supplemental brief filed
10/07/1982Submitted
08/19/1982Submission
06/22/1982Brief filed
05/27/1982Brief filed
03/12/1982Record filed
11/17/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/18/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
319,647
life