judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00038-CV
02-81-00038-CV
11/16/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Woolaver, Calvin
Texaco, Inc. & Nolan M. Boydston
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/10/1982Writ DisposedRefused
10/01/1982Writ Filed
07/23/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
271st District Court
Wise
Honorable R. T. Driver
13,562