judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00798-CR
14-81-00798-CR
11/17/1981
Burglary
Holland, Jerry Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/12/1985Case stored
06/13/1983Mandate Issued
05/03/1983No description available.
04/14/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/26/1983Submitted
12/22/1982Case ready to be set
09/28/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
08/31/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
03/22/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
01/28/1982Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
11/17/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/12/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
334,748
19 yrs.