Case Information: 35411 | |||
Short Caption: | MEDALLION FUNDING VS. PRUFER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A400422 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/10/2000 / Segerblom, Richard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Steven Marzullo, Ltd.--check no. 13662. | ||
12/29/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-13373 | |
01/10/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Richard Segerblom. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/09/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 11, 2000. | 00-03743 | |
10/19/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 00-18582 | |
10/31/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion filed on October 19, 2000, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK | 00-19145 | |
10/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |